+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 1, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On January 28, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 8, Noes 4
On January 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On December 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On October 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment
- Introduced by Representatives Loudenbeck, Brandtjen, Dittrich, Felzkowski, Novak, Quinn, Skowronski, Thiesfeldt, Tusler, Knodl and Born; cosponsored by Senators Testin, Fitzgerald, Cowles and Olsen
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor