+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On December 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 1
- Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 1
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 1
On November 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On November 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Novak
On November 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Novak
On November 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced by Representatives Novak, Hintz, Edming, Steffen and Tusler; cosponsored by Senators Harsdorf, Bewley and Olsen