+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
- Representative Shankland added as a coauthor
On November 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Workforce Development and take up, Ayes 39, Noes 56
On March 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On March 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development
- Introduced by Representatives Pasch, Milroy, Hebl, C. Taylor, Bewley, Kahl, Ringhand, Jorgensen, Berceau, Bernard Schaber, Barca, Pope, Ohnstad, Billings and Kolste; cosponsored by Senators Lassa, Hansen, Miller, Lehman, C. Larson and Shilling
+ − Vote
November 5, 2013: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Workforce Development and take up
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 56
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor