+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Published 3-12-2022
- Report approved by the Governor on 3-11-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 178
On March 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 3-10-2022
On February 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 2-25-2022
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Read a second time
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 32, Noes 0
- Ordered immediately messaged
On February 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 2-15-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
On November 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
On October 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On October 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read a second time
- Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 94, Noes 0
- Ordered immediately messaged
On October 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 10-26-2021 by Committee on Rules
On October 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 4
On October 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Joint Committee on Finance
- Executive action taken
On October 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to joint committee on Finance
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 11, Noes 0
On October 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On September 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representative Knodl added as a coauthor
On September 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representative Plumer added as a coauthor
On August 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
- Fiscal estimate received
On July 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced by Representatives August, Loudenbeck, Horlacher, Spiros, Wichgers, Brooks, Rozar, Steffen, Kuglitsch, Gundrum, Murphy, Subeck, Dittrich, Brandtjen, Mursau, Kurtz, Moses and Born; cosponsored by Senators Petrowski, Nass and Cowles
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 15, 2022: Read a third time and concurred in
- Yeas: 31
October 26, 2021: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 94
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor