+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On January 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Young
On January 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 7, Noes 5
- Report Assembly Amendment 3 adoption recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 8, Noes 4
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
- Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Young
On December 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Hutton
On October 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Hutton
On October 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor
On October 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Hutton
On September 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On August 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions
- Introduced by Representatives Hutton, Tusler, Allen, Ballweg, Gannon, Horlacher, Jarchow, Kuglitsch, Murphy, Quinn, Rohrkaste and Spiros; cosponsored by Senators Wanggaard, Stroebel, Kapenga and Nass
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor