+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On July 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Published 7-2-2015
- Report approved by the Governor on 7-1-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 25
On June 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 6-30-2015
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 6-18-2015
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 6-9-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources and Energy
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On April 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On April 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 4-14-2015 by Committee on Rules
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 13, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On April 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor
- Public hearing held
On March 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On February 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage
- Introduced by Representatives Kleefisch, Ballweg, R. Brooks, Danou, Knodl, Krug, Mursau, Ripp, Thiesfeldt, Tittl and Murphy; cosponsored by Senators S. Fitzgerald, Harsdorf, Gudex, Moulton, Nass and Olsen
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor