+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report concurrence as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Labor, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Labor, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
- Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Vukmir and Grothman
On November 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On November 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Labor
On November 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On November 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read a second time
- Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 56, Noes 38
- Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representative Spiros
- Assembly Amendment 4 adopted
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed
- Ordered immediately messaged
On November 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Kessler and Goyke
On November 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 11-12-2013 by Committee on Rules
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice, Ayes 6, Noes 1
- Executive action taken
On November 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Kessler and Goyke
On October 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kessler
On October 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On October 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice
- Introduced by Representatives Spiros, Johnson, Ballweg, Barca, Berceau, Bies, Brooks, Czaja, Kahl, Kleefisch, Marklein, Nass, Ohnstad, A. Ott, Pridemore, Thiesfeldt and Tittl; cosponsored by Senators Vukmir, L. Taylor, Lehman and Risser
+ − Amendments (5)
Senate Substitute Amendment 1
Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Labor, Ayes 5, Noes 0
Assembly Amendment 4
Assembly Amendment 4 adopted
Assembly Amendment 3
Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 56, Noes 38
Assembly Amendment 2
Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Kessler and Goyke
Assembly Amendment 1
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kessler
+ − Vote
November 12, 2013: Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 38
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor