+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On February 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Published 2-7-2014
- Report approved by the Governor on 2-6-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 128
On January 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 1-30-2014
- Report correctly enrolled on 1-30-2014
On January 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 31, Noes 1
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 1-22-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report concurrence recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 1
- Executive action taken
On December 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Fiscal estimate received
On November 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to joint committee on Finance
On November 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On November 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read a second time
- Assembly Amendment 2 adopted
- Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
- Representative Barca added as a coauthor
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 93, Noes 0, Paired 2
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Rules suspended
On November 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 11-12-2013 by Committee on Rules
On November 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 9, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 9, Noes 0
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Petersen
On November 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On November 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Representative Doyle added as a coauthor
On October 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Petersen
- Fiscal estimate received
On October 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On October 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- LRB correction
On October 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Health
- Introduced by Representatives Petersen, Nerison, Petryk, Severson, Jagler, Tittl, Sanfelippo, Steineke, Bies, Murphy, Strachota, Swearingen, Kolste, Williams, Czaja, Tauchen, Berceau, Mursau, Johnson, Pasch, Kaufert, Brooks, Tranel, Hebl, A. Ott, Wachs, Bernier, Wright, Riemer, LeMahieu, Danou, Billings, Bewley, Genrich and Hulsey; cosponsored by Senators Olsen, Petrowski, Carpenter, Shilling, Lasee, Harris, Lehman, Wirch, Hansen, Schultz and Darling
+ − Amendments (2)
Assembly Amendment 2
Assembly Amendment 2 adopted
Assembly Amendment 1
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
+ − Votes (2)
January 22, 2014: Read a third time and concurred in
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 1
November 12, 2013: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 93
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor