+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 1, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 26, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 15, Noes 0
On December 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Representative Steffen added as a coauthor
On October 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Representative Stafsholt added as a coauthor
On October 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On October 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
- Representative Vining added as a coauthor
On September 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Representative C. Taylor added as a coauthor
- Fiscal estimate received
On September 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Representative Novak added as a coauthor
On September 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities
- Introduced by Representatives Skowronski, Sinicki, VanderMeer, Hesselbein, Allen, Anderson, Billings, Bowen, Brandtjen, Brostoff, Considine, Doyle, Duchow, Edming, Emerson, Fields, Gruszynski, Hebl, Horlacher, Jagler, James, Katsma, Knodl, Krug, Kulp, Kurtz, Loudenbeck, Magnafici, B. Meyers, Milroy, Murphy, Ohnstad, Oldenburg, Ott, Petersen, Petryk, Plumer, Pope, Ramthun, Riemer, Rodriguez, Sargent, Shankland, Sortwell, Spiros, Spreitzer, Stubbs, Stuck, Subeck, Summerfield, Thiesfeldt, Tittl, Tranel, Tusler, Vruwink, Wittke, Zamarripa, Zimmerman, Gundrum and Felzkowski; cosponsored by Senators Roth, Kooyenga, Miller, Risser, Carpenter, Cowles, Darling, Erpenbach, Feyen, Hansen, Kapenga, Larson, LeMahieu, Marklein, Nass, Petrowski, Ringhand, Schachtner, L. Taylor, Wanggaard, Wirch, Testin, Fitzgerald and Bernier
+ − Sponsors (84)
Type:
Primary Sponsor