+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On December 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 15, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 15, Noes 0
On November 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On November 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Quinn
On October 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On October 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage
- Introduced by Representatives Quinn, Danou, A. Ott, Kleefisch, Nerison, Tittl, Edming, Milroy, Born, Rohrkaste, Horlacher, Petryk, Allen, Knodl, Mason, Gannon and T. Larson; cosponsored by Senators Moulton and Harsdorf
+ − Amendment
2015 ASA1-AB448
- Relating to: exceptions to the prohibition against trapping without a license and requirements for tagging traps.
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor