+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On April 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On February 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 62, Noes 37
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
- Read a second time
On February 6, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 2-11-2020 by Committee on Rules
On January 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 8, Noes 6
- Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 10, Noes 6
On January 23, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On December 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On November 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Horlacher and Murphy
On September 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Representative Wittke added as a coauthor
On September 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities
- Introduced by Representatives Horlacher, Vos, Murphy, Allen, Brandtjen, Dittrich, Duchow, Edming, Felzkowski, Gundrum, James, Katsma, Kitchens, Knodl, Krug, Kuglitsch, Kulp, Macco, Magnafici, Quinn, Ramthun, Rohrkaste, Skowronski, Sortwell, Steffen, Tauchen, Thiesfeldt and Tusler; cosponsored by Senators Kapenga, Stroebel, Bernier, Craig and Olsen
+ − Amendment
2019 ASA1-AB444
- Relating to: free expression within the University of Wisconsin and Technical College Systems, providing an exemption from rule-making procedures, and granting rule-making authority.
+ − Vote
February 11, 2020: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 37
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor