+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On January 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 16, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 16, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 16, Noes 0
On January 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On December 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Kooyenga
On December 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kooyenga
On December 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On October 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On October 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations
- Introduced by Representatives Kooyenga, Nygren, Craig, LeMahieu, Marklein, Kleefisch, Tittl, Petryk, Bies, Williams and Strachota; cosponsored by Senators Lasee, Grothman and Cowles
+ − Amendments (2)
Assembly Amendment 2
Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 16, Noes 0
Assembly Amendment 1
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 16, Noes 0
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor