+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On November 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Laid on the table
On November 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 11-9-2017 by Committee on Rules
On October 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 13, Noes 0
On September 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On August 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On June 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced by Representatives Kitchens, Bowen, Brostoff, Horlacher, Kooyenga, Kremer, Murphy, Ripp, Tittl, Tusler and Spreitzer; cosponsored by Senators Olsen, L. Taylor, Darling and Feyen
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor