+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Published 4-17-2014
- Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 285
On April 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 4-15-2014
On April 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 4-3-2014
On April 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 18, Noes 15
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 4-1-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
On November 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
- Available for scheduling
On November 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On November 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 56, Noes 38
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On November 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 11-12-2013 by Committee on Rules
On October 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor, Ayes 5, Noes 3
On October 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On October 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On October 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor
- Introduced by Representatives Born, Kestell and Jacque; cosponsored by Senator S. Fitzgerald
+ − Votes (2)
April 1, 2014: Read a third time and concurred in
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 15
November 12, 2013: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 38
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor