+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Withdrawn from committee on Rules and referred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Assembly Rule 24 (3)(a)
On February 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 15, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0
On February 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On January 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On January 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ripp
On March 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced by Representatives Ripp, Ballweg, Bernier, Billings, Brooks, Doyle, Endsley, Krug, Marklein, Mursau, A. Ott and Spiros; cosponsored by Senators Petrowski, Tiffany, Jauch and Shilling
+ − Amendment
Assembly Amendment 1
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor