+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (43)
On April 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Published 4-24-2014
- Report approved by the Governor on 4-23-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 348
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 4-22-2014
On April 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 4-3-2014
On April 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Ordered immediately messaged
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 4-1-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs
- Received from Assembly
On February 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read a second time
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adopted
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed
On February 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 2-18-2014 by Committee on Rules
On February 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Bies
On February 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice, Ayes 8, Noes 2
- Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice, Ayes 7, Noes 3
- Report Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice, Ayes 10, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice, Ayes 10, Noes 0
On February 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Goyke, Johnson, Kessler and Wachs
On January 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Bies
- Executive action taken
- Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Bies
On January 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Bies
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Goyke
On December 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
- Fiscal estimate received
On November 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Representative Hulsey added as a coauthor
On November 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Withdrawn from committee on Judiciary and referred to committee on Criminal Justice pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c)
On October 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced by Representatives Bies, C. Taylor, Berceau, Goyke, Kahl, Kessler and T. Larson; cosponsored by Senators L. Taylor, Lehman and Risser
+ − Amendments (6)
Assembly Substitute Amendment 2
Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adopted
Assembly Amendment 3
Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Goyke, Johnson, Kessler and Wachs
Assembly Amendment 2
Report Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice, Ayes 10, Noes 0
Assembly Amendment 1
Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice, Ayes 10, Noes 0
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1
Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice, Ayes 7, Noes 3
Assembly Amendment 1
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Goyke
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor