+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 22, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Laid on the table
On February 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 by Committee on Rules
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 15, Noes 0
On October 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On October 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representative Penterman added as a coauthor
- Public hearing held
On September 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representative Ramthun added as a coauthor
On September 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representative Kurtz added as a coauthor
On June 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor
On June 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced by Representatives James, Armstrong, Behnke, Brandtjen, Brooks, Callahan, Dallman, Dittrich, Duchow, Edming, Gundrum, Knodl, Kuglitsch, Magnafici, Moses, Pronschinske, Rozar, Skowronski, Snyder, Spiros, Subeck, Mursau and Tusler; cosponsored by Senators Bradley, Cowles, Felzkowski, Nass and Wanggaard
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor