+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
- Available for scheduling
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Barca, C. Taylor and Shankland
- Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table
- Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table
- Read a second time
- Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 32
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed
- Ordered immediately messaged
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Made a special order of business at 1:11 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29
On February 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Kessler
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kessler
On February 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 10, Noes 2
On January 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Executive session held
On January 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On November 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On October 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On October 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On October 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety
- Introduced by Representatives Horlacher, Edming, Hutton, Knodl, Kremer, T. Larson, Novak, Sanfelippo and Steffen; cosponsored by Senators Wanggaard, Cowles, Gudex, Nass and Olsen
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
February 18, 2016: Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 32
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor