+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On November 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Laid on the table
- Representative Wright added as a coauthor
On October 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 11-5-2013 by Committee on Rules
On October 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Ayes 15, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Ayes 15, Noes 0
On October 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On October 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Loudenbeck
On October 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senator Leibham added as a cosponsor
- Fiscal estimate received
On October 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On October 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development
- Introduced by Representatives Loudenbeck, Kuglitsch, Ballweg, Bernier, Czaja, Endsley, Kahl, Kestell, Kolste, Krug, LeMahieu, Marklein, Nygren, Ohnstad, Petryk, Sinicki, Stone, Thiesfeldt, Weatherston, Vruwink, Kaufert and Bernard Schaber; cosponsored by Senators Lazich, Moulton, Cowles, Darling, C. Larson, Lehman, Olsen, Shilling and L. Taylor
+ − Amendment
Assembly Amendment 1
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Ayes 15, Noes 0
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor