+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On November 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Laid on the table
- Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Hulsey
On October 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 11-5-2013 by Committee on Rules
On October 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0
On October 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On October 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Petryk
- Executive action taken
- Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Ayes 14, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Ayes 14, Noes 0
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Ayes 14, Noes 0
- Referred to Joint Committee on Finance
On October 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Petryk
- Public hearing held
- Fiscal estimate received
On October 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Representative Wright added as a coauthor
- Fiscal estimate received
On October 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development
- Introduced by Representatives Petryk, Stone, Born, Schraa, Jagler, Marklein, Ballweg, Krug, Kestell, Kleefisch, Nass, T. Larson, Weatherston, Nygren, Tauchen, LeMahieu, Pridemore, Tranel, Loudenbeck, Bies, Endsley and A. Ott; cosponsored by Senators Gudex, Grothman, Darling, Lehman, Leibham, Schultz, Lassa and Cowles
+ − Amendments (3)
Assembly Amendment 3
Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Hulsey
Assembly Amendment 2
Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0
Assembly Amendment 1
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor