+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On April 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On November 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Laid on the table
- Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives C. Taylor, Mason, Kessler, Berceau, Hesselbein, Pasch, Clark, Sinicki, Zepnick, Ringhand, Kolste, Bernard Schaber, Shankland, Billings, Johnson, Ohnstad, Goyke, Pope and Hebl
On October 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 11-5-2013 by Committee on Rules
On October 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0
On October 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Joint Committee on Finance
On October 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
- Fiscal estimate received
On October 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Finance
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 9, Noes 1
- Executive action taken
On October 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On October 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Children and Families
- Introduced by Representatives Krug, Ballweg, Stone, Petryk, Marklein, Wright, Kestell, Nygren, Kleefisch, T. Larson, Bies, Jagler, Weatherston, Tranel, Pridemore, Bernier, Endsley and LeMahieu; cosponsored by Senators Gudex, Darling, L. Taylor and Lehman
+ − Amendments (2)
Assembly Amendment 2
Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives C. Taylor, Mason, Kessler, Berceau, Hesselbein, Pasch, Clark, Sinicki, Zepnick, Ringhand, Kolste, Bernard Schaber, Shankland, Billings, Johnson, Ohnstad, Goyke, Pope and Hebl
Assembly Amendment 1
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor