+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On September 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Laid on the table
On September 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 9-28-2021 by Committee on Rules
On September 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight, Ayes 8, Noes 1
- Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight, Ayes 8, Noes 1
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight, Ayes 8, Noes 1
On September 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
- Executive action taken
On September 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representative Plumer added as a coauthor
On September 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Magnafici
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Magnafici
On August 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representative James added as a coauthor
On June 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representative Born added as a coauthor
On June 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On June 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight
- Introduced by Representatives Magnafici, Wittke, Allen, Brandtjen, Cabral-Guevara, Callahan, Dallman, Dittrich, Duchow, Edming, Gundrum, Kitchens, Kuglitsch, Loudenbeck, Moses, Mursau, Petryk, Ramthun, Rozar, Snyder, Steffen, Tauchen, Thiesfeldt, Tusler, VanderMeer, Wichgers and Zimmerman; cosponsored by Senators Felzkowski, Darling, Bernier, Bradley, Feyen, Jagler, Stroebel and Wimberger
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor