+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On October 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Swearingen
On September 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representative James added as a coauthor
On August 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On August 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representative Penterman added as a coauthor
On June 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced by Representatives Swearingen, Edming, Armstrong, Brooks, Callahan, Mursau, Sortwell, Summerfield, Thiesfeldt, Tusler, VanderMeer and Vorpagel; cosponsored by Senators Stafsholt, Felzkowski, Bernier and Feyen
+ − Amendment
2021 ASA1-AB372
- Relating to: passenger restrictions on all-terrain vehicles.
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor