+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 10, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Amendment 3 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 10, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 10, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 10, Noes 0
On February 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On February 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Bewley
- Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Bewley
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Bewley
On February 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On October 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On September 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced by Representative Bewley; cosponsored by Senator Jauch
+ − Amendments (3)
Assembly Amendment 3
Report Assembly Amendment 3 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 10, Noes 0
Assembly Amendment 2
Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 10, Noes 0
Assembly Amendment 1
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 10, Noes 0
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor