+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On October 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Urban and Local Affairs, Ayes 9, Noes 0
On October 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On October 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor
- Public hearing held
On October 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senator Bewley added as a cosponsor
On September 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Urban and Local Affairs
- Introduced by Representatives Horlacher, Allen, Ballweg, Brandtjen, R. Brooks, Goyke, Jacque, Katsma, Kooyenga, Macco, Mason, Neylon, Novak, Petersen, Steffen and Swearingen; cosponsored by Senators Nass, Kapenga, Lasee, Miller, Olsen, Petrowski, Tiffany and Wirch
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor