+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Insurance and take up, Ayes 34, Noes 59
On July 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On June 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance
- Introduced by Representatives Riemer, Kolste, C. Taylor, Anderson, Barca, Berceau, Billings, Bowen, Brostoff, Considine, Crowley, Doyle, Fields, Genrich, Goyke, Hebl, Hesselbein, Hintz, Kessler, Mason, Meyers, Milroy, Ohnstad, Pope, Sargent, Shankland, Sinicki, Spreitzer, Stuck, Subeck, Vruwink, Wachs, Young, Zamarripa and Zepnick; cosponsored by Senators Erpenbach, Johnson, Shilling, Bewley, Carpenter, Hansen, Larson, Miller, Ringhand, Risser, L. Taylor, Vinehout and Wirch
+ − Vote
February 22, 2018: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Insurance and take up
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 59
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor