+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On February 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Representative Ohnstad withdrawn as a coauthor
On February 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On February 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ott
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Small Business Development
- Introduced by Representatives Ott, Stafsholt, Rohrkaste, Spreitzer, Sinicki, Kooyenga, Jarchow, Gannon, Jacque, Ballweg, C. Taylor, Ohnstad, Novak, Murphy, E. Brooks, Mursau, Genrich, Weatherston, Brandtjen, Edming, Kleefisch, Skowronski, Tusler, Thiesfeldt, Macco, Duchow and Quinn; cosponsored by Senators Harsdorf, Ringhand, Moulton, Vinehout, Testin, LeMahieu, Vukmir, Bewley, Olsen, Stroebel, Kapenga, Craig, Marklein and Hansen
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor