+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Published 3-4-2020
- Report approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 129
On February 28, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 2-28-2020 by directive of the Speaker
On February 17, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 2-17-2020
- LRB correction
On February 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Action ordered immediately messaged
- Senate Amendment 1 concurred in
On February 6, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 2-11-2020 by Committee on Rules
On January 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
On January 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1)
On January 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate amended and concurred in as amended (Senate amendment 1 adopted)
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in as amended
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Senate Amendment 1 adopted
- Read a second time
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
- Available for scheduling
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen
On November 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On November 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
- Read a second time
On November 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 11-12-2019 by Committee on Rules
On November 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Insurance, Ayes 11, Noes 0
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Insurance, Ayes 11, Noes 0
On October 31, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Representative Thiesfeldt added as a coauthor
On October 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On October 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On October 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steffen
On October 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On August 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Representative Emerson added as a coauthor
On August 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance
- Introduced by Representatives Steffen, Ohnstad, Bowen, Brooks, Dittrich, Doyle, Felzkowski, Fields, Goyke, Gundrum, Horlacher, Krug, Kulp, Nygren, Ramthun, Skowronski, Spreitzer, Stubbs, Stuck, C. Taylor, Vruwink, Duchow and Macco; cosponsored by Senators Feyen, Bewley, Erpenbach, Miller, Olsen, Petrowski and Schachtner
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor