+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On October 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Published 10-24-2013
- Report approved by the Governor on 10-23-2013. 2013 Wisconsin Act 48
On October 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 10-22-2013
- Report correctly enrolled on 10-22-2013
On October 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On October 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Ordered immediately messaged
On October 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 10-15-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
On October 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
- Received from Assembly
On October 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
- Representative Barca added as a coauthor
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed
- Ordered immediately messaged
On October 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 10-8-2013 by Committee on Rules
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 10, Noes 1
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 11, Noes 0
On October 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On September 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On September 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Mursau
On September 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced by Representatives Mursau, Swearingen, Czaja, T. Larson, Murtha, Nygren, Spiros and Tittl; cosponsored by Senators Petrowski, Tiffany, Grothman and Jauch
+ − Amendment
Assembly Amendment 1
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor