+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On December 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Published 12-13-2013
- Report approved by the Governor on 12-12-2013. 2013 Wisconsin Act 75
On December 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 12-10-2013
On November 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 11-21-2013
On November 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Read a second time
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 32, Noes 1
- Ordered immediately messaged
On November 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On November 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 11-12-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Referred to Joint Committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0
On November 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report concurrence recommended by Natural Resources, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On October 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On October 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
- Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources
On October 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 94, Noes 2
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
- Read a second time
- Placed at the foot of the calendar of 10-8-2013
- Ordered immediately messaged
On October 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 10-8-2013 by Committee on Rules
On October 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 16, Noes 0
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 16, Noes 0
On September 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On September 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Bies
On September 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
- Fiscal estimate received
On September 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On September 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage
- Introduced by Representatives Bies, A. Ott, T. Larson, Czaja, Tittl, Williams and Stroebel; cosponsored by Senators Lasee, Kedzie, Tiffany and Miller
+ − Amendment
Assembly Amendment 1
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
+ − Votes (2)
November 12, 2013: Read a third time and concurred in
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
October 8, 2013: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor