+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 1, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 26, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 9, Noes 0
On January 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On October 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Representative Edming added as a coauthor
- Public hearing held
On July 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection
- Introduced by Representatives Duchow, Skowronski, Milroy, Tusler, Quinn, Sortwell, Kitchens, Tittl, Kulp, Kuglitsch, Horlacher, Sanfelippo, Hutton, Dittrich, Spiros, Wichgers, Felzkowski, Kurtz, Ramthun, C. Taylor, James, Stafsholt, Plumer and Rodriguez; cosponsored by Senators Kapenga, Olsen, Nass and Smith
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor