+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 7, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Published 3-5-2022
- Report approved by the Governor on 3-4-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 155
On March 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 3-3-2022
On February 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 2-25-2022
- LRB correction
On February 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 2-15-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Available for scheduling
- Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 4, Noes 0
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Health
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On January 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On January 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 1-20-2022 by Committee on Rules
On November 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Substance Abuse and Prevention, Ayes 8, Noes 0
On November 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On October 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On September 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On June 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representative Plumer added as a coauthor
On May 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On May 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Substance Abuse and Prevention
- Introduced by Representatives Zimmerman, Horlacher, James, Krug, Steffen and Wichgers; cosponsored by Senator Darling