+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On May 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Laid on the table
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 5-13-2015 by Committee on Rules
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 10, Noes 2
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 0
On April 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tittl
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On April 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Representative Macco added as a coauthor
On March 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On February 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced by Representatives Tittl, Rohrkaste, Born, Ballweg, E. Brooks, Kremer, Murphy, A. Ott, Quinn, Spiros and Weatherston; cosponsored by Senators Harsdorf, LeMahieu and Roth
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor