+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On December 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0
On December 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On December 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On November 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Education
On November 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read a second time
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed
- Ordered immediately messaged
On November 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On November 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 11-9-2017 by Committee on Rules
On June 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight, Ayes 7, Noes 1
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On June 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On May 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight
- Introduced by Representatives Thiesfeldt, Hutton, Kulp, Kremer, R. Brooks, Tusler and Gannon; cosponsored by Senators Stroebel and Nass
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor