+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On December 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Published 12-13-2013
- Report approved by the Governor on 12-12-2013. 2013 Wisconsin Act 85
On December 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 12-10-2013
On September 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 9-26-2013
On September 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On September 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On September 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 9-17-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
On August 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report concurrence recommended by Natural Resources, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
On August 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On June 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
- Read a second time
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 6-12-2013 by Committee on Rules
On April 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 16, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 16, Noes 0
On April 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On April 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Mursau, Stroebel and Danou
On March 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On February 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage
- Introduced by Joint Legislative Council
+ − Amendment
Assembly Amendment 1
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
+ − Sponsor
Joint Legislative Council
Type:
Primary Sponsor