+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
- Placed on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
On April 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Report vetoed by the Governor on 4-15-2022
On April 13, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 4-13-2022
On February 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 2-25-2022
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read a second time
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 20, Noes 12
- Ordered immediately messaged
On February 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 2-15-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Available for scheduling
- Report concurrence without recommendation, pursuant to Senate Rule 27 (4)(a), by Committee on Health, Ayes 2, Noes 2
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public hearing held
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Health
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On June 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 60, Noes 37
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
On June 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representative Steffen added as a coauthor
On June 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 6-16-2021 by Committee on Rules
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Constitution and Ethics, Ayes 6, Noes 3
- Executive action taken
On June 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representative Edming added as a coauthor
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representative Allen added as a coauthor
- Public hearing held
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Representative Behnke added as a coauthor
On May 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Constitution and Ethics
- Introduced by Representatives August, Pronschinske, Moses, Sortwell, Vorpagel, Macco, Plumer, Rozar, Murphy, Wittke, Tusler, Wichgers, Callahan, Dallman, Horlacher, Armstrong, VanderMeer, Cabral-Guevara, Spiros, Schraa, Brandtjen, Kurtz, Swearingen, Loudenbeck, Ramthun, Kuglitsch, Born, Vos and Thiesfeldt; cosponsored by Senators Felzkowski, Nass, Jacque, Bernier, Stroebel and Roth
+ − Votes (2)
February 15, 2022: Read a third time and concurred in
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 12
June 16, 2021: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 37
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor