+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On April 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Trade, Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Executive action taken
- Available for scheduling
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Trade
On November 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On November 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to a third reading
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
- Read a second time
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed
- Ordered immediately messaged
On November 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 11-7-2019 by Committee on Rules
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 8, Noes 2
- Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 10, Noes 0
On October 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On October 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Oldenburg
On October 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Oldenburg
On September 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced by Representative Oldenburg; cosponsored by Senator Testin
+ − Amendments (2)
2019 ASA1-AB294
- Relating to: changing the 12 percent rule regarding the total value of taxable property included in the creation of a tax incremental financing district in the village of Ontario.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor