+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On April 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety and take up, Ayes 36, Noes 63
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
- Fiscal estimate received
On February 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On February 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety
- Introduced by Representatives Kessler, Barnes, Bowen, Brostoff, Johnson, Young, C. Taylor, Mason, Zamarripa and Subeck; cosponsored by Senators L. Taylor, C. Larson and Harris Dodd
+ − Vote
April 14, 2015: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety and take up
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 63
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor