+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Published 3-28-2014
- Report approved by the Governor on 3-27-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 157
On March 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2014
On February 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 2-28-2014
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read a second time
- Read a third time and concurred in
- Ordered immediately messaged
On February 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 2-18-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
- Available for scheduling
- Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On February 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read a second time
- LRB correction (Assembly Substitute Amendment 1)
- Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
- Read a third time and passed
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Ordered immediately messaged
On February 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 2-13-2014 by Committee on Rules
On January 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Murphy
On October 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Urban and Local Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 3
On October 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On September 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On September 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On August 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Urban and Local Affairs
- Introduced by Representatives Murphy, Bernard Schaber, Thiesfeldt, Kestell, Mursau, A. Ott, Bernier and Tittl; cosponsored by Senator Grothman
+ − Amendment
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor