+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On October 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Laid on the table
On October 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 10-26-2021 by Committee on Rules
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 13, Noes 0
On October 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On July 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On April 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On April 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Health
- Introduced by Representatives Horlacher, Bowen, Brooks, Cabral-Guevara, Dittrich, Duchow, Gundrum, Hong, Magnafici, Moses, Murphy, Rozar, Schraa, Skowronski, Subeck and Wichgers; cosponsored by Senators Bernier, Ringhand and Testin
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor