+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On May 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kulp
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
- Fiscal estimate received
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced by Representatives Kulp, Knodl, Kremer, Jarchow, Skowronski, Gannon, Jacque, Hutton, Edming, R. Brooks, Kleefisch, Murphy, Tusler, Thiesfeldt, Ott, Krug, Quinn, August, Ripp, Brandtjen and Sanfelippo; cosponsored by Senators Stroebel, Craig, Lasee, Wanggaard, LeMahieu, Kapenga, Nass, Feyen, Marklein and Harsdorf
+ − Amendment
2017 ASA1-AB277
- Relating to: eliminating the personal property tax and making an appropriation.
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor