+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On November 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Laid on the table
On November 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 11-7-2017 by Committee on Rules
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Tourism, Ayes 14, Noes 0
On November 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On October 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Tourism
- Introduced by Representatives Ballweg, Bernier, R. Brooks, Horlacher, Kooyenga, Ripp, Skowronski, Spiros, Tauchen, Thiesfeldt and Tusler; cosponsored by Senators Olsen and Nass
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor