+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (51)
On December 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Published 12-14-2013
- Report approved by the Governor on 12-13-2013. 2013 Wisconsin Act 105
On December 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Presented to the Governor on 12-12-2013
On October 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Report correctly enrolled on 10-18-2013
On October 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Vinehout, Harris, T. Cullen, C. Larson, Lassa, Hansen, Carpenter, Risser and L. Taylor
- Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Vinehout, Harris, Lehman, T. Cullen, C. Larson, Lassa, Hansen, Carpenter, Risser and L. Taylor
- Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senators Vinehout, Harris, Lehman, T. Cullen, C. Larson, Lassa, Hansen, Carpenter, Risser and L. Taylor
- Senate Amendment 4 offered by Senators Vinehout, Harris, Lehman, T. Cullen, C. Larson, Lassa, Hansen, Carpenter, Risser and L. Taylor
- Read a second time
- Senate Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 18, Noes 15
- Senate Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 18, Noes 15
- Senate Amendment 3 laid on table
- Senate Amendment 4 laid on table
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time
- Refused to refer to committee on Judiciary and Labor, Ayes 15, Noes 18
- Concurred in, Ayes 23, Noes 10
- Ordered immediately messaged
On October 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Received from Senate concurred in
On October 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar 10-8-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
- Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
On October 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Available for scheduling
- Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Labor, Ayes 4, Noes 1
On October 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Labor
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On May 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered immediately messaged
- Read a third time and passed, Ayes 60, Noes 36
- Rules suspended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Assembly Amendment 5 laid on table, Ayes 58, Noes 38
- Assembly Amendment 4 adopted
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 58, Noes 38
- Read a second time
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Goyke
On May 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Made a special order of business at 1:02 PM on 5-8-2013 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 9
- Assembly Amendment 5 offered by Representatives Goyke, Hebl and Wachs
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 5-8-2013 by Committee on Rules
On April 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 5, Noes 3
- Report Assembly Amendment 4 adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 8, Noes 0
On April 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On April 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representative Kuglitsch
On April 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Goyke, Wachs and Hebl
- Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Goyke, Wachs and Hebl
On March 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On March 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kuglitsch
On March 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Fiscal estimate received
On February 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced by Representatives Kuglitsch, August, A. Ott, Craig, Stone, Schraa, Jacque, Spiros, Stroebel and Thiesfeldt; cosponsored by Senators Grothman, Vukmir and Farrow
+ − Amendments (10)
Senate Amendment 4
Senate Amendment 4 laid on table
Senate Amendment 3
Senate Amendment 3 laid on table
Senate Amendment 2
Senate Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 18, Noes 15
Senate Amendment 1
Senate Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 18, Noes 15
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 58, Noes 38
Assembly Amendment 5
Assembly Amendment 5 laid on table, Ayes 58, Noes 38
Assembly Amendment 4
Assembly Amendment 4 adopted
Assembly Amendment 3
Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Goyke, Wachs and Hebl
Assembly Amendment 2
Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Goyke, Wachs and Hebl
Assembly Amendment 1
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kuglitsch
+ − Votes (7)
October 8, 2013: Senate Amendment 1 laid on table
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 15
October 8, 2013: Senate Amendment 2 laid on table
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 15
October 8, 2013: Refused to refer to committee on Judiciary and Labor
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 18
October 8, 2013: Concurred in
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 10
May 8, 2013: Assembly Amendment 5 laid on table
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 38
May 8, 2013: Read a third time and passed
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 36
May 8, 2013: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 38
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor