+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On August 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Representative Goyke added as a coauthor
On July 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Representative Allen added as a coauthor
On June 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Representative Spreitzer added as a coauthor
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations
- Introduced by Representatives J. Ott, Berceau, Murphy, E. Brooks, A. Ott, Kitchens, Rohrkaste, Mursau, Stuck, Brandtjen, Subeck, T. Larson and Spiros; cosponsored by Senators Lazich, Darling, Nass, Carpenter, Wirch and L. Taylor
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor