+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Laid on the table
On March 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 3-7-2017 by Committee on Rules
On February 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 0
On February 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On January 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On January 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kooyenga
- Fiscal estimate received
- Representative Spiros added as a coauthor
On January 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced by Representatives Kooyenga, Steffen, Tittl, Bernier, Horlacher, Katsma, Macco, Duchow, Murphy, Knodl and Hutton; cosponsored by Senators Marklein, Kapenga, LeMahieu, Cowles and Ringhand
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor