+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 1, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 26, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 11, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 11, Noes 0
On September 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On September 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Tusler and Stuck
On August 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On June 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Representative Emerson added as a coauthor
On June 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety
- Introduced by Representatives Tusler, Stuck, Anderson, Crowley, Kulp, Mursau, L. Myers, Ohnstad, Ramthun, Sargent, Sinicki, Subeck, C. Taylor, Thiesfeldt, Vruwink and Neubauer; cosponsored by Senators Jacque, Carpenter, Larson, Risser and Wanggaard
+ − Amendment
2019 ASA1-AB259
- Relating to: stalking.
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor