+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 1, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 8, Noes 1
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 9, Noes 0
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On April 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Horlacher and Hebl
On March 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On February 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced by Representatives Horlacher, Hebl, Ballweg, Brandtjen, Edming, Knodl, Novak, Quinn, Ramthun, Rodriguez, Spreitzer, Steffen, Stuck, C. Taylor, Thiesfeldt, Tusler, Vruwink, Brooks and Subeck; cosponsored by Senators Wanggaard, Jacque, Carpenter, Cowles, Feyen, Marklein, Olsen and Stroebel
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor