+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from Assembly
On May 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 64, Noes 34
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Pope, Hebl, Considine, Genrich, Vruwink and Barca
- Read a second time
- Ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Read a third time and passed
- Ordered immediately messaged
On April 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Placed on calendar 5-2-2017 by Committee on Rules
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 8, Noes 6
- Executive action taken
On April 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
On April 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Representative R. Brooks added as a coauthor
On April 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced by Representatives Tusler, Thiesfeldt, Gannon, Katsma, Kitchens, Kremer, Kulp, Quinn, Weatherston, Wichgers and Zimmerman
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
May 2, 2017: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 34
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor