+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 1, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On March 26, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to committee on Rules
- Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 14, Noes 0
On January 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Representative C. Taylor added as a coauthor
On September 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
On July 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Representative Bowen added as a coauthor
On July 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Public hearing held
- Representatives Pope, Kitchens and Vruwink added as coauthors
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced by Representatives L. Myers, Rohrkaste, Stubbs, Ohnstad, Crowley and Subeck; cosponsored by Senators Kooyenga, L. Taylor, Carpenter, Jacque, Feyen and Smith
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor