+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On April 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
On June 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Legislative Audit Committee, Ayes 10, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Amendment 5 adoption recommended by Joint Legislative Audit Committee, Ayes 10, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Amendment 4 adoption recommended by Joint Legislative Audit Committee, Ayes 10, Noes 0
- Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Legislative Audit Committee, Ayes 10, Noes 0
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On June 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Executive action taken
- Fiscal estimate received
- LRB correction
On June 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Sargent
- Public hearing held
- Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sargent
- Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sargent
- Fiscal estimate received
- Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Sargent
- Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representative Kerkman
- Assembly Amendment 5 offered by Representative Kerkman
- Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representative Sargent
On June 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time and referred to Joint Legislative Audit Committee
- Introduced by Representatives Kerkman, Tittl, A. Ott, Petryk, Ripp, Mursau, Bernier, Weininger and Ballweg; cosponsored by Senators Cowles, Vinehout, Carpenter, Harsdorf, Petrowski, T. Cullen, Schultz, Kedzie and Miller
+ − Amendments (7)
Assembly Amendment 1
Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representative Sargent
Assembly Amendment 5
Report Assembly Amendment 5 adoption recommended by Joint Legislative Audit Committee, Ayes 10, Noes 0
Assembly Amendment 4
Report Assembly Amendment 4 adoption recommended by Joint Legislative Audit Committee, Ayes 10, Noes 0
Assembly Amendment 3
Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Sargent
Assembly Amendment 2
Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Sargent
Assembly Amendment 1
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Legislative Audit Committee, Ayes 10, Noes 0
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sargent
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor